Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne de Vilazel (Virazel)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Nov 1631AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
1 Feb 1632Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
1 Jun 1641DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne de Vilazel (Virazel):
Bishop Etienne de Vilazel (Virazel) (died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 121
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015