Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mathieu Ysoré d’Hervault

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647¹BornBossay-sur-Claise
26 Oct 169346.8AppointedBishop of Condom, France
1 Nov 169346.8SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
22 Dec 169346.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
25 Feb 169447.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tours, France
9 Jul 171669.5DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathieu Ysoré d’Hervault:
Archbishop Mathieu Ysoré d’Hervault (born 1647, died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 168, and Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015