Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Symphorien Bullioud

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1508AppointedBishop of Glandèves, France
14 Jan 1521AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
1 Jul 1528AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
5 Jan 1534DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Symphorien Bullioud
Bishop Symphorien Bullioud (died ) Bishop of Soissons

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327, and Page 306
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1508, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast