Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-François Le Févre de Laubriéres

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1687Born
26 Jul 173144.5SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
3 Sep 173144.6ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
13 Jan 173245.0Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
25 Dec 173851.9DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François Le Févre de Laubriéres:
Bishop Charles-François Le Févre de Laubriéres (died ) Bishop of Soissons

  • a bishop for 6.9 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015