Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Daniel Huet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avranches


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1630BornCaen
13 Nov 168555.8SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
5 May 169262.2AppointedBishop of Avranches, France
24 Aug 169262.5Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
20 Apr 169969.2ResignedBishop of Avranches, France
25 Jan 172191.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Daniel Huet:
Bishop Pierre-Daniel Huet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avranches

  • a bishop for 28.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 65, and Page 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013