Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Roucy-Sissonne

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1557AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
3 Jan 1559Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
6 Oct 1585DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Roucy-Sissonne
Bishop Charles de Roucy-Sissonne (died ) Bishop of Soissons

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGuillemittes, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1559, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018