Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Brezé

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Sep 1553AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
1564¹ResignedBishop of Meaux, France
3 Apr 1571AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
15 Sep 1589DiedBishop of Meaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Brezé (VIAF: 188498971)
Bishop Louis de Brezé (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 240
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018