Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Guillart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senlis, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1491¹Born
8 Jun 151322.4AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
10 Mar 152534.1AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
16 Oct 155362.7AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
4 Sep 156069.6AppointedBishop of Senlis, France
156170.0ResignedBishop of Senlis, France
5 Nov 156574.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Senlis, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Guillart (VIAF: 172190973)
Bishop Louis Guillart (born 1491, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senlis

EventPlace
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 143, and Page 316
  • b: CB, 28 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 14 Oct 2017