Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Terrail de Baynard, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Feb 1532AppointedBishop of Glandèves, France
10 Nov 1532Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
15 May 1535DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Terrail de Baynard
Bishop Jacques Terrail de Baynard O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Glandèves

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,323
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast