Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de La Guiche

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mirepoix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1506¹Born
30 Mar 154135.2AppointedBishop of Agde, France
16 Mar 154438.2Ordained BishopBishop of Agde, France
17 Aug 154741.6AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
1553¹47.0ResignedBishop of Mirepoix, France
1556¹50.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mirepoix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de La Guiche (VIAF: 204931979)
Bishop Claude de La Guiche (born 1506, died 1556) Bishop Emeritus of Mirepoix

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint-Germain-des-Près, Monastery, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 97, and Page 246
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018