Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Danès

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1497¹Born
9 Aug 155760.6AppointedBishop of Lavaur, France
14 Nov 155760.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lavaur, France
23 Apr 157780.3DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Danès (VIAF: 9882374)
Bishop Pierre Danès (born 1497, died ) Bishop of Lavaur

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Feb 2017