Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Dodieu

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jul 1539AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rennes, France
20 Sep 1541SucceededBishop of Rennes, France
4 Apr 1558DiedBishop of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Claude Dodieu:
Bishop Claude Dodieu (died ) Bishop of Rennes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013