Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Olivier

Deceased

Bishop of Lombez, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 May 1546AppointedBishop of Digne, France
19 Feb 1548Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
12 Sep 1552AppointedBishop of Lombez, France
17 Feb 1560DiedBishop of Lombez, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Olivier (VIAF: 56762444)
Bishop Antoine Olivier (died ) Bishop of Lombez

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSaint-Thomas du Louvre, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186, and Page 227

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast