Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Foucault de Bonneval

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1511AppointedApostolic Administrator of Limoges, France
18 Aug 1514AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
1 Jul 1528AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
4 Aug 1531AppointedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
1540²DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Foucault de Bonneval:
Bishop Foucault de Bonneval Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 272, and Page 327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 306, and Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013