Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hervé Jean Robert Giraud

Bishop of Viviers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1957 Born
24 Mar 198528.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Viviers, France
22 Sep 198528.5Ordained PriestPriest of Viviers, France
15 Apr 200346.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
15 Apr 200346.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Silli
25 May 200346.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Silli
13 Nov 200750.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
22 Feb 200850.9SucceededBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
5 Mar 201558.0AppointedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
5 Mar 201558.0AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
19 Apr 201558.1InstalledArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
19 Apr 201558.1InstalledPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
13 Mar 202467.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viviers, France
14 Apr 202467.1InstalledBishop of Viviers, France
21 May 202568.2ResignedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

MicroData Summary
Hervé Jean Robert Giraud
Archbishop Hervé Jean Robert Giraud
(born )
Bishop of Viviers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTournon, Diocese of Viviers
Ordained DeaconSaint-Julien, Church, Tournon, Diocese of Viviers
Ordained PriestSaint-Julien, Church, Tournon, Diocese of Viviers
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean, Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Diocese of Viviers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,383
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2015
  • i: CB, 19 Apr 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Mar 2024
  • i: CB, 13 Mar 2024
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 4 May 2024
  • r: Bollettino, 21 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 21 May 2025