Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph Christophe

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons (-Laon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1803Born
9 Jun 182724.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 186057.6SelectedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
18 Mar 186157.9ConfirmedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
5 May 186158.0Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
10 Aug 186360.3DiedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Christophe
Bishop Jean-Joseph Christophe (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons (-Laon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochesson
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast