Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Honoré Bara

Deceased

Bishop of Châlons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1798BornSainte-Vaubourg
21 Sep 182224.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 185657.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Châlons, France
16 Jun 185658.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Châlons, France
16 Jun 185658.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
20 Jul 185658.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea
1 Jan 186061.6SucceededBishop of Châlons, France
11 Jul 186466.1DiedBishop of Châlons, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Honoré Bara:
Bishop Jean-Honoré Bara (born , died ) Bishop of Châlons

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 191, and Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013