Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Gustave Bossuyt

Deceased

Prelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

Titular Bishop of Chunavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1921Born
29 Oct 195029.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 197150.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
3 Aug 197150.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
19 Sep 197150.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chunavia
3 Apr 197453.1AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
30 Jul 197453.5DiedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

MicroData Summary for André Gustave Bossuyt
Bishop André Gustave Bossuyt (born , died ) Prelate of Mission de France o Pontigny

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTourcoing

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018