Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Milon des Dormans

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1371AppointedBishop of Angers, France
16 Jun 1374AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
31 Jan 1375AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
17 Aug 1387DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Milon des Dormans
Bishop Milon des Dormans (died ) Bishop of Beauvais

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 88, and Page 125
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast