Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie Cottret

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1768BornArgenteuil
23 Apr 179123.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 182456.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
3 May 182456.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
29 Jun 182456.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
2 Jan 183869.7SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
12 Feb 183869.8ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
13 Nov 184173.5DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie Cottret:
Bishop Pierre-Marie Cottret (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 109, and Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013