Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Villiers de L’Isle-Adam

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1519AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
10 Jan 1530AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
27 Sep 1535DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Villiers de L’Isle-Adam
Bishop Charles de Villiers de L’Isle-Adam (died ) Bishop of Beauvais

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222, and Page 131
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,519, Number 35*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast