Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard de Chevenon

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1395AppointedBishop of Agen, France
19 Jun 1398AppointedBishop of Saintes, France
20 Mar 1411AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
29 Mar 1413AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
16 Feb 1420DiedBishop of Beauvais, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard de Chevenon
Bishop Bernard de Chevenon (died ) Bishop of Beauvais

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 132, and Page 85
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 537, and Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jun 2020

Quantcast