Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Gilles du Coêtlosquet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1700BornLeonen
14 Dec 173939.2AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
7 Feb 174039.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
13 Mar 174039.5InstalledBishop of Limoges, France
11 Nov 175858.2ResignedBishop of Limoges, France
21 Mar 178483.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Gilles du Coêtlosquet:
Bishop Jean-Gilles du Coêtlosquet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoges

  • a bishop for 44.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013