Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Hyacinthe de La Fruglaye de Kervers

Deceased

Bishop of Tréguier, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1687Born
24 Sep 171225.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Dec 173144.8SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
31 Mar 173245.0ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
4 May 173245.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
23 Dec 174558.8DiedBishop of Tréguier, France

MicroData Summary for François-Hyacinthe de La Fruglaye de Kervers
Bishop François-Hyacinthe de La Fruglaye de Kervers (born , died ) Bishop of Tréguier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Martin-des-Prés

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,732, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 413

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast