Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin de Maupeou

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1648¹BornParis
3 Jul 168234.5SelectedBishop of Castres, France
7 Dec 169345.9ConfirmedBishop of Castres, France
10 Jan 169446.0Ordained BishopBishop of Castres, France
11 Apr 170557.2SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
7 Sep 170557.6ResignedBishop of Castres, France
16 Nov 170557.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
12 Jun 171264.4DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Augustin de Maupeou:
Archbishop Augustin de Maupeou (born 1648, died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 108, and Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015