Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Madeleine Frézeau de Frèzelière

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1654BornPoitiers
24 Dec 169339.3SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
17 May 169439.7ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
27 Jun 169439.8Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
4 Nov 170248.2DiedBishop of La Rochelle, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Madeleine Frézeau de Frèzelière:
Bishop Charles-Madeleine Frézeau de Frèzelière (born , died ) Bishop of La Rochelle

  • a bishop for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013