Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Milon

Deceased

Bishop of Condom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658¹BornTours
1 Nov 169335.8SelectedBishop of Condom, France
22 Dec 169335.9ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
14 Feb 169436.1Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
24 Jan 173476.0DiedBishop of Condom, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Milon:
Bishop Louis Milon (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Condom

  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 168
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 17 Jun 2015