Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-François Cardinal de la Trémoille

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France

Administrator of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1465¹Born
5 Nov 149025.8AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
5 Dec 150540.9AppointedAdministrator of Poitiers, France
18 Dec 150641.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jun 150742.4DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de la Trémoille
Jean-François Cardinal de la Trémoille (born 1465, died ) Archbishop of Auch

EventPlace
Birth Place
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Thouars

  • a cardinal for .5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1506
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018