Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal d’Este

Deceased

Administrator of Auch, France

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538¹Born
1 May 155012.3AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
26 Feb 156123.1Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 156224.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
8 Oct 156325.7AppointedAdministrator of Auch, France
22 Oct 156325.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Septisolio
31 Jul 157739.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
19 Dec 158345.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
30 Dec 158648.9DiedAdministrator of Auch, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi d’Este (VIAF: 61353628)
Luigi Cardinal d’Este (born 1538, died ) Administrator of Auch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArezzo, Diocese of Arezzo, Italy
Death PlaceMontegiordano
Buried Place (Original)S. Luigi dei Francesi, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria Maggiore, Cathedral, Tivoli, Diocese of Tivoli, Italy

  • a cardinal for 25.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 51*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast