Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Arnaud Cardinal d’Ossat

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1537Born
9 Sep 159659.1AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
27 Oct 159659.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
3 Mar 159961.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159961.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
26 Jun 160062.9AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
13 Mar 160466.6DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

MicroData Summary for Arnaud d’Ossat (VIAF: 49283322)
Arnaud Cardinal d’Ossat (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLarroque-Magnoac, Archdiocese of Auch
Ordained BishopS. Marc, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Sainte-Jeanne de Valois chapel, S. Luigi dei Francesi, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 107, and Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast