Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Honoré du Laurens

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1554BornTarascon
24 Jan 160146.8AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
24 Feb 160146.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
16 Dec 160147.7InstalledArchbishop of Embrun, France
24 Jan 161257.8DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Honoré du Laurens:
Archbishop Honoré du Laurens (born , died ) Archbishop of Embrun

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1601
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 37, Number 188
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 190
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015