Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François L’Archiver

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornPlouezoch, Finistère
17 Jun 160232.4AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
24 Jun 160232.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
22 Feb 161949.1DiedBishop of Rennes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François L’Archiver:
Bishop François L’Archiver (died ) Bishop of Rennes

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 4 Feb 2015