Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François Cardinal de Tournon, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Superior General of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1489BornChâteau of Tournon
30 Jul 151829.6AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
8 Jan 152637.0AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
9 Mar 153041.2Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 153041.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
27 Jun 153748.5ResignedArchbishop of Bourges, France
14 Jun 153849.5AppointedAdministrator of Auch, France
154253.0AppointedSuperior General of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
28 Feb 155061.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
155162.0ResignedAdministrator of Auch, France
11 May 155162.4AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
13 Mar 156071.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
22 Apr 156273.3DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for François de Tournon:
Cardinal François de Tournon C.R.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a cardinal for 32.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1530
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 190, and Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013