Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Ignace-Joseph de Simiane de Gordes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1679BornCaromb
20 Sep 171738.2SelectedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
27 Jun 171838.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
21 Aug 171839.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
16 Dec 174364.4ResignedBishop of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France
7 Dec 176788.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Claude-Ignace-Joseph de Simiane de Gordes:
Bishop Claude-Ignace-Joseph de Simiane de Gordes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux

  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 2 Sep 2015