Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Palmieri

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1675³BornSienne
27 Jun 170024.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jul 170024.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 172852.6AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
14 Mar 172852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
26 Mar 173963.6DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Palmieri:
Bishop Cristoforo Palmieri (born , died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015