Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Brizi

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1688BornBorgo di San Pietro
31 Jul 171224.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Aug 171224.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 174152.9AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
4 Jun 174152.9Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
23 Jul 174153.0InstalledBishop of Marsi, Italy
6 Sep 176072.2DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Brizi:
Bishop Domenico Antonio Brizi (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015