Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Innocenzo Sanseverino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alife

Titular Archbishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1696³BornNocera dei Pagani
7 Jul 172024.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 174649.9AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
13 Mar 174649.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
12 Mar 175356.9AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
29 Dec 175660.7ResignedBishop of Alife, Italy
3 Jan 175760.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
10 Jul 176266.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Sanseverino:
Archbishop Innocenzo Sanseverino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alife

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 77, and Page 295
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015