Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Anton Miocevich

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1731BornSibenik
21 Dec 175423.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 176634.9AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
20 Apr 176634.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
Oct 1786³55.4DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Anton Miocevich:
Bishop Johann Anton Miocevich (born , died Oct 1786) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1766, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015