Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Monti

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1713BornSenigallia
26 May 173623.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 175036.7AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
25 Jan 175036.7Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
14 Apr 176652.9AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
8 Sep 178774.3DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Monti:
Archbishop Domenico Monti (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013