Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Spana

Deceased

Bishop of Segni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1719³BornVeroli
2 Feb 175535.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Feb 175535.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 176646.6AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Apr 176646.6Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
29 Feb 178464.4DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Spana:
Bishop Andrea Spana (born , died ) Bishop of Segni

  • a priest for 29.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015