Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Battiloro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Severo

Titular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1710³BornArpino
1 Jan 174332.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jan 174332.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 176656.0AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
20 Apr 176656.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
25 Nov 176757.6ResignedBishop of San Severo, Italy
14 Dec 176757.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Battiloro:
Archbishop Tommaso Battiloro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Severo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 169, and Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015