Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Benedetto Scaramuccia

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1709Born
21 Apr 175343.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176858.3AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
28 Feb 176858.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
19 Jan 177565.3DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Benedetto Scaramuccia
Bishop Eugenio Benedetto Scaramuccia (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampoli

  • a priest for 21.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018