Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Capra

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1712Born
12 Apr 173522.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 175542.7AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
23 Feb 175542.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
22 Dec 177260.6DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Capra
Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Capra (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzano

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 93
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast