Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Alfonso Maria de’ Liguori, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1696BornMarianella di Napoli
21 Dec 172630.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Jun 176265.7AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
20 Jun 176265.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
26 Jun 177578.7RetiredBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
1 Aug 178790.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
6 Sep 1815Beatified
26 May 1839Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Alfonso Maria de’ Liguori:
Bishop St. Alfonso Maria de’ Liguori C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 69
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 22 Sep 2013