Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Luigi Avogadro, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1708BornNovara
23 Dec 173022.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
22 Dec 173123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
19 Nov 175950.9AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
25 Nov 175950.9Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
22 May 179283.4DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Luigi Avogadro:
Bishop Giuseppe Luigi Avogadro C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015