Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Valenti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1695BornTrevi
31 Mar 173640.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 175964.4AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
24 Sep 175964.4Elevated to Cardinal
14 Oct 175964.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
19 Nov 175964.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
20 Dec 176267.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
Sep 1763³68.3ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
18 Oct 176368.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Valenti:
Ludovico Cardinal Valenti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015