Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Acqua

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1693BornOsimo
16 Sep 174350.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to France
24 Mar 174450.8ResignedApostolic Internuncio to France
23 May 175259.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 May 175259.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 175966.5AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
25 Nov 175966.5Ordained BishopBishop of Spoleto, Italy
31 Mar 177278.9DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Acqua
Bishop Vincenzo Acqua (born , died ) Bishop of Spoleto

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 40
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Oct 2016