Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Agostino della Chiesa

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1717Born
23 Sep 174124.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 175437.1SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
17 Feb 175537.4ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
23 Feb 175537.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
11 Aug 175537.9DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Agostino della Chiesa
Bishop Francesco Agostino della Chiesa (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino

  • a priest for 13.8 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 442
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018