Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Genovesi

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1725Born
22 Mar 174923.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 176337.7AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
27 Mar 176337.7Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
26 May 177852.9DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Diego Genovesi
Bishop Diego Genovesi (born , died ) Bishop of Squillace

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReggio de Calabre

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018