Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Spedalieri

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1705BornGuardavalle
24 Sep 172924.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 175853.8AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
24 Dec 175853.8Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
29 Jan 177064.9AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
5 Apr 178378.1DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Spedalieri:
Bishop Nicola Spedalieri (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1767
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013